TN HB2538 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the criminal offense of recklessly, by any means of communication, threatening to commit an act of mass violence and the threat causes a reasonable expectation or reasonable fear of the commission of an act of mass violence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3 and Title 40, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3 and Title 40, Chapter 11, relative to mass violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2342 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024