TN HB2533 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 893
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 893
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a sheriff, deputy sheriff, or constable serving an order of protection or ex parte order of protection to make reasonable efforts, prior to or at the time of service, to determine whether the person being served has an outstanding criminal warrant. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 36, relative to service of process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 893 | |
2022-03-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2746 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022