TN HB2530 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Heart to Heart Act," which encourages schools to offer automated external defibrillator device training to school bus drivers. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 68, relative to automated external defibrillator devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/29/2022 | |
2022-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 948 | |
2022-04-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0807) |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2824 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 948