TN HB2528 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/22/2022
Pending: House Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/22/2022
Pending: House Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the requirements for professional counselors designated as mental health service providers and the field experience needed for such positions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 24 and Title 63, Chapter 22, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 24 and Title 63, Chapter 22, Part 1, relative to mental health service providers.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2365 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee