TN HB2508 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 871
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 871
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of human services to June 30, 2014, and requires the division of state audit to send follow-up questions to the department of human services in 2013 regarding actions taken by the department to address the issues raised in the January 2012 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the department of human services to June 30, 2014, and requires the division of state audit to send follow-up questions to the department of human services in 2013 regarding actions taken by the department to address the issues raised in the January 2012 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 871 | |
2012-04-12 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-10 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2462 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 871