TN HB2494 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a sportsman's license is not required in order to assist a person with a disability who is fishing or hunting pursuant to a discounted license or an exemption from licensure, if certain requirements are met, including executing a form and compliance with certain laws by the assistant. - Amends TCA Title 70.
Title
As enacted, specifies that a sportsman's license is not required in order to assist a person with a disability who is fishing or hunting pursuant to a discounted license or an exemption from licensure, if certain requirements are met, including executing a form and compliance with certain laws by the assistant. - Amends TCA Title 70.
Sponsors
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 737 | |
2020-06-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Meeeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee cal. for 3/17/20 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2300 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 737