TN HB2489 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Failed in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Failed in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each high school to inform each high school senior upon reaching the age of 18 that the student is eligible to vote and provide information about how to register to vote; authorizes the use of an identification card issued by an accredited postsecondary institution of education in this state for purposes of verifying a person's identification at a polling place; deletes the requirement for a person who registers to vote by mail or online to vote the first time in person. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2 and Title 49, relative to the Tennessee Student Voter Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Failed in Local Government Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2064 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.