TN HB2460 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the department of labor and workforce development to establish a three-year pilot program to assist adults 19 years of age or older with obtaining a high school diploma. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, directs the department of labor and workforce development to establish a three-year pilot program to assist adults 19 years of age or older with obtaining a high school diploma. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 6/4/2020 |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1982 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-26 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0