TN HB2459 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 920
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 920
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the offense of unlawful photography to include the photographing of an individual without the consent of the individual, if the photograph includes the unclothed intimate area of the individual and would be considered offensive or embarrassing by the individual; was taken for the purpose of offending, intimidating, embarrassing, ridiculing, or harassing the victim; and was disseminated by the defendant to any other person or the defendant threatened to disseminate, or permitted the dissemination of, the photograph. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, relative to unlawful photography.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 920 | |
2022-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2362 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022