TN HB2435 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1058
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1058
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain provisions of the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act of 1998 and the Local Tourism Development Zone Business Tax Act. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, revises certain provisions of the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act of 1998 and the Local Tourism Development Zone Business Tax Act. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1058 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 1 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0988) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1139) |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2056 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1058