TN HB2426 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires driver education courses to include an area of instruction on the impact of talking and texting on a mobile phone on a student's driving abilities. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires driver education courses to include an area of instruction on the impact of talking and texting on a mobile phone on a student's driving abilities. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 16 BY WILLIAMS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 14 BY HOLT PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION AMENDMENT # 6 BY AKBARI PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 6 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 16 BY WILLIAMS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 14 BY HOLT PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION AMENDMENT # 6 BY AKBARI PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 6 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 16 - HA1337) |
2018-04-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 14 - HA1327) |
2018-04-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1202) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 8 - HA1306) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 6 - HA1297) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 15 - HA1334) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 13 - HA1323) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 12 - HA1322) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 11 - HA1321) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 10 - HA1308) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 9 - HA1307) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 7 - HA1303) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - HA1290) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA1289) |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA1286) |
2018-04-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0916) |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Re-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-03-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1502 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-25 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.