TN HB2426 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 957
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 957
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires all LEAs using the uniform grading system for lottery scholarship purposes, and another grading system based on quality points for other purposes, to award additional quality points for honors and other advanced courses uniformly. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires all LEAs using the uniform grading system for lottery scholarship purposes, and another grading system based on quality points for other purposes, to award additional quality points for honors and other advanced courses uniformly. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 957 | |
2016-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/5/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Education Administration & Planning |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs--Education Administration |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1831 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 957
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2426&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2426.pdf |