TN HB2421 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-11)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 972
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-11)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 972
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, encourages TBI to develop an activation card for law enforcement use in connection with the missing citizen alert program to help locate missing citizens who have wandered due to dementia or physical impairment. - Amends TCA Section 38-6-121.
Title
As enacted, encourages TBI to develop an activation card for law enforcement use in connection with the missing citizen alert program to help locate missing citizens who have wandered due to dementia or physical impairment. - Amends TCA Section 38-6-121.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 972 | |
2016-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Criminal Justice |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2049 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 972
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2421&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2421.pdf |