TN HB2418 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a sexual offender or violent sexual offender to report to a designated law enforcement agency to update the offender's registration within five days of the offender's birthday, rather than seven days. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, requires a sexual offender or violent sexual offender to report to a designated law enforcement agency to update the offender's registration within five days of the offender's birthday, rather than seven days. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2586 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee