TN HB2417 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a person who was convicted of an infamous crime after July 1, 1986, but before July 1, 1996, to petition a circuit court for restoration of the person's full rights of citizenship in the same manner established for persons convicted on or after July 1, 1996. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 34 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 34 and Title 40, relative to restoration of rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2166 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.