TN HB2401 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the public utility commission to post on its website in a manner accessible to the general public an electronic copy of the most recent annual report to the general assembly and governor on all matters relating to the commission for the preceding year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 35, Chapter 8, Part 1; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 54; Title 55; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the public utility commission to post on its website in a manner accessible to the general public an electronic copy of the most recent annual report to the general assembly and governor on all matters relating to the commission for the preceding year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 35, Chapter 8, Part 1; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 54; Title 55; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2850 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee