TN HB2401 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 866
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 866
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing liens under the Tennessee Condominium Act of 2008. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 27.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing liens under the Tennessee Condominium Act of 2008. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 27.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 866 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 06/01/2016 | |
2016-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 0, PNV 5 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0925) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 4, PNV 0 |
2016-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0976) |
2016-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2397 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 866