TN HB2358 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revives and reconstitutes the judicial nominating commission, which automatically terminated on June 30, 2012, pursuant to §§ 4-29-133(a)(15) and 4-29-112; revises provisions relating to the board of judicial conduct. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revives and reconstitutes the judicial nominating commission, which automatically terminated on June 30, 2012, pursuant to §§ 4-29-133(a)(15) and 4-29-112; revises provisions relating to the board of judicial conduct. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-19 - House - CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-05HouseTaken Off Notice For Cal. in: Civil Justice Committee
2014-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/5/2014
2014-02-26HouseAction Def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/5/2014
2014-02-19HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/26/2014
2014-02-19HouseRec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2014-02-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2014
2014-02-12HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2014-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee--Government Operations for review
2014-02-05HouseIntro., P1C.
2014-02-04HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2075 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-29 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback