TN HB2354 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 634
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 634
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that the limits on loans to any one borrower must take into consideration credit exposure arising from derivative transactions between the state bank and the person. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, specifies that the limits on loans to any one borrower must take into consideration credit exposure arising from derivative transactions between the state bank and the person. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 634 | |
2012-03-15 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-03-08 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/29/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Action Def. in Government Operations Committee to 2/29/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/22/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Government Operations Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 2/8/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to s/c Commerce Subcommittee | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee --Gov. Op. for review | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2216 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 634