TN HB2350 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 846
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 846
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the City of Cleveland and Hardeman County to participate in the Tennessee local land bank program. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 30.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the City of Cleveland and Hardeman County to participate in the Tennessee local land bank program. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 30.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 846 | |
2018-04-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2347 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 846