TN HB2348 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Pub. Ch. 681
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Pub. Ch. 681
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits intentional destruction of imagination library program books intended to be delivered to children enrolled in the program; requires best efforts to deliver books or, in the alternative, to make the books available for pre-kindergarten, kindergarten or elementary programs. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 52, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, prohibits intentional destruction of imagination library program books intended to be delivered to children enrolled in the program; requires best efforts to deliver books or, in the alternative, to make the books available for pre-kindergarten, kindergarten or elementary programs. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 52, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 681 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Effective date(s) 04/14/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-03-17 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2014-03-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2462 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 681