TN HB2302 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pr. Ch. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pr. Ch. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, deletes charter provision that allows county residents who do not live within the city limits but own at least a 50 percent fee simple interest in real property in the city to vote in municipal elections. - Amends Chapter 198 of the Acts of 1901; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, deletes charter provision that allows county residents who do not live within the city limits but own at least a 50 percent fee simple interest in real property in the city to vote in municipal elections. - Amends Chapter 198 of the Acts of 1901; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Pr. Ch. 32 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-03-03 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-02-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2014-02-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2422 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 32