TN HB2291 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends for four years the current $2.00 filing fee charged by clerks and data fee entry chargeable by clerks, except in certain cases brought by the state and state agencies; extension effective until July 1, 2020, unless continued by general assembly. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401; Section 8-21-409 and Chapter 1039 of the Public Acts of 2012.
Title
As introduced, extends for four years the current $2.00 filing fee charged by clerks and data fee entry chargeable by clerks, except in certain cases brought by the state and state agencies; extension effective until July 1, 2020, unless continued by general assembly. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401; Section 8-21-409 and Chapter 1039 of the Public Acts of 2012.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2054 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2291&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2291.pdf |