TN HB2268 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, states that due process is the right of every Tennessean and it is the intent of the general assembly that statutes addressing a defendant's rights in a criminal prosecution be implemented and interpreted in a manner that is consistent with due process requirements under the United States Constitution as now or hereafter interpreted by the United States supreme court. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 20; Title 21; Title 23; Title 24; Title 26; Title 28; Title 29; Title 30; Title 35; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 42; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 46; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 62; Title 63; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 20; Title 21; Title 23; Title 24; Title 26; Title 28; Title 29; Title 30; Title 35; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 42; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 46; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 62; Title 63; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 71, relative to due process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2834 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee