TN HB2255 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a 21-member task force to study the equine industry; the task force will make a report and cease to exist by January 15, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 43; Title 44 and Title 63, Chapter 12.
Title
As introduced, creates a 21-member task force to study the equine industry; the task force will make a report and cease to exist by January 15, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 43; Title 44 and Title 63, Chapter 12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee--Governement Operations for review |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2487 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2255&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2255.pdf |