TN HB2246 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends eligibility for tuition reimbursement provided to members of the Tennessee national guard under the STRONG Act of 2017 to include technical certificates and diplomas and certain graduate programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, extends eligibility for tuition reimbursement provided to members of the Tennessee national guard under the STRONG Act of 2017 to include technical certificates and diplomas and certain graduate programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-06-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Higher Education Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2177 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee