TN HB2232 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes requirement that on June 30, 2013, the commissioner of finance and administration transfer from the special trust fund to the general fund, a certain amount for funding transition costs related to the closure of Lakeshore Mental Health Institute; redirects the expenditure of certain trust proceeds used by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities and the department of mental health and substance abuse services. - Amends TCA Section 12-2-117.
Title
As introduced, deletes requirement that on June 30, 2013, the commissioner of finance and administration transfer from the special trust fund to the general fund, a certain amount for funding transition costs related to the closure of Lakeshore Mental Health Institute; redirects the expenditure of certain trust proceeds used by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities and the department of mental health and substance abuse services. - Amends TCA Section 12-2-117.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2163 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee