TN HB2219 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the reporting of a patient's involuntary commitment to an inpatient treatment facility to local law enforcement so that the information may be reported to the FBI-NICS Index and the department of safety; specifies that a pharmacy or pharmacist has the right to provide an insured information regarding the amount of the insured's cost share for a prescription drug. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the reporting of a patient's involuntary commitment to an inpatient treatment facility to local law enforcement so that the information may be reported to the FBI-NICS Index and the department of safety; specifies that a pharmacy or pharmacist has the right to provide an insured information regarding the amount of the insured's cost share for a prescription drug. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1015 | |
2018-04-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2362 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1015