TN HB2204 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the date by which the state board of education must require a course in Tennessee history for students from the 2018-2019 school year to the 2019-2020 school year. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1015 and Chapter 482 of the Public Acts of 2017.
Title
As enacted, revises the date by which the state board of education must require a course in Tennessee history for students from the 2018-2019 school year to the 2019-2020 school year. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1015 and Chapter 482 of the Public Acts of 2017.
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 699 | |
2018-03-26 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1471 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 699