TN HB2179 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 787
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 787
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires TEMA to determine the number of emergency services coordinators necessary for each department and agency; requires emergency services coordinators to attend training; makes other various changes related to emergency services coordinators. - Amends TCA Section 58-2-108.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 58-2-108, relative to emergency services coordinators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 787 | |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2429 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022