TN HB2159 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1050
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1050
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Elderly and Vulnerable Adult Protection Act of 2018." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Elderly and Vulnerable Adult Protection Act of 2018." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: 3,4 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1050 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018; 01/01/219 | |
2018-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-30 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-25 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 3,4 Ayes 85, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2159 |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1084) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA1184) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA1174) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1173) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1259) |
2018-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1184) |
2018-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1095) |
2018-04-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Criminal Justice |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2621 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1050