TN HB2156 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 45 to 60, the number of days a child care person or entity may receive an extension on a temporary certificate from the state board of education to operate a child care program prior to the issuance of an initial annual certificate of approval. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2672 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee