TN HB2136 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a public entity from entering into a contract with a company unless the contract includes a written certification that the company is not currently engaged in, and will not for the duration of the contract engage in, a boycott of Israel. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 12.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 12, relative to discrimination against Israel.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2136&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/HB2136.pdf |