TN HB2134 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1049
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises the interest rate on certain unpaid child support arrearages; revises provisions governing the age at which a person may be issued a marriage license; creates a cause of action for forced marriage. - Amends TCA Title 36.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises the interest rate on certain unpaid child support arrearages; revises provisions governing the age at which a person may be issued a marriage license; creates a cause of action for forced marriage. - Amends TCA Title 36.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 12 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 12 by Yarbro (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 1049
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 05/21/2018; 07/01/2018
2018-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2018-05-10HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-05-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-05-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-30HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-25HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 12 Ayes 82, Nays 0 PNV 1 HB2134
2018-04-24HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/25/2018
2018-04-24SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 2
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 11 - SA1193)
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 10 - SA1192)
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 9 - SA1191)
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 8 - SA1190)
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 7 - SA1189)
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 6 - SA1188)
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - SA1187)
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - SA1186)
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA1185)
2018-04-24SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 12 - SA1196)
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0943)
2018-04-24SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0941)
2018-04-24SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-04-24SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-24HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-24HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-24HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1116)
2018-04-24HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1115)
2018-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-09HousePlaced behind the budget
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018
2018-04-04HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-27HouseAction def. in Civil Justice Committee to 4/3/2018
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2018-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2018-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2268 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1049

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback