TN HB2118 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a court to revoke a defendant's probation and suspension of sentence for a misdemeanor offense based upon one instance of a technical violation or violations; specifies that the court may revoke the defendant's probation and suspension of sentence in full or in part, and may sentence the defendant to a sentence of probation for the remainder of the unexpired term; adds "contacting the defendant's victim in violation of a condition of probation or parole" as an act that may result in revocation of probation or parole. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to sentencing.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. John Gillespie [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 1060 | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 4 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0811) |
2022-04-27 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1029) |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2288 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1060