TN HB2111 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a member of the Tennessee Commission for the United States Semiquincentennial Commission to designate a person to carry out the member's responsibilities and duties under the Tennessee Commission for the United States Semiquincentennial Commission Act. - Amends Chapter 384 of the Public Acts of 2019.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 384 of the Public Acts of 2019, relative to the "Tennessee Commission for the United States Semiquincentennial Commission Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1951 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn.