TN HB2110 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the use of surveillance cameras on interstate highways for aiding law enforcement with criminal investigations only. - Amends TCA Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the use of surveillance cameras on interstate highways for aiding law enforcement with criminal investigations only. - Amends TCA Title 55.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20HouseReset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20
2020-03-18HouseReset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20
2020-03-16HouseReset on cal. for 3/19/2020
2020-03-12HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020
2020-03-04HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/4/2020
2020-02-25HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/25/2020
2020-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2020-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2020-02-03HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2090 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/18/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback