TN HB2109 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes the Tennessee horse racing commission to regulate horse racing and pari-mutuel wagering in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 44; Title 62 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes the Tennessee horse racing commission to regulate horse racing and pari-mutuel wagering in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 44; Title 62 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2018-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
2018-03-21HouseFailed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-02-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2018-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2018-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-30HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1908 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Deferred to Summer Study

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback