TN HB2100 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows eligible financial institutions and qualified business enterprises to carry forward any unused amount of credits against franchise and excise tax liabilities beyond the tax years in which the applicable credits originated. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, allows eligible financial institutions and qualified business enterprises to carry forward any unused amount of credits against franchise and excise tax liabilities beyond the tax years in which the applicable credits originated. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1970 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2100&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2100.pdf |