TN HB2086 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires sellers of dyed diesel fuel to offer the same discount off the sales price of each gallon of such fuel purchased by eligible farmers that motor carriers receive. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, requires sellers of dyed diesel fuel to offer the same discount off the sales price of each gallon of such fuel purchased by eligible farmers that motor carriers receive. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1888 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-02 - Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2086&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2086.pdf |