TN HB2083 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 10 to 20, the number of calendar days after the 90 days from the date a child was surrendered that the department of children's services shall file a petition on behalf of an abandoned infant seeking termination of parental rights. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 37 and Title 40, relative to parental rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1973 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee