TN HB2024 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to convene a child protective investigation team when a report of severe child abuse is received; expands the role and procedures of a child protective team investigation to include cases involving severe child abuse. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 39, relative to child protective investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915 | |
2022-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1911 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/27/2022