TN HB2021 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires compliance with state and federal constitutions as well as judicial decisions in passing congressional redistricting plan. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 3.
Title
As introduced, requires compliance with state and federal constitutions as well as judicial decisions in passing congressional redistricting plan. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1879 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2021&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2021.pdf |