TN HB2019 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes the University of Tennessee Southern as a new campus of the University of Tennessee in Giles County. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 9, relative to the creation of a new campus of the University of Tennessee.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 648 | |
2022-02-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-02-24 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/28/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1980 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/15/2022