TN HB2004 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to accept allegations of opioid abuse or diversion and to publicize a means of reporting allegations of such; prohibits civil liability for or firing of a person who reports suspected abuse or diversion. - Amends TCA Title 50 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, requires the department to accept allegations of opioid abuse or diversion and to publicize a means of reporting allegations of such; prohibits civil liability for or firing of a person who reports suspected abuse or diversion. - Amends TCA Title 50 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Beth Harwell [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 675 | |
2018-04-17 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2019 | |
2018-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0818) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0733) |
2018-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2022 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 675