TN HB1984 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of correction to submit an annual report to the criminal justice committee of the house of representatives and the judiciary committee of the senate detailing the use of sentencing reduction credits in Tennessee, including recommendations for improving the effectiveness of the program. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of correction to submit an annual report to the criminal justice committee of the house of representatives and the judiciary committee of the senate detailing the use of sentencing reduction credits in Tennessee, including recommendations for improving the effectiveness of the program. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2143 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-29 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1984&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1984.pdf |