TN HB1981 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 997
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 997
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Healthy Workplace Act", which requires TACIR to create a model policy for employers to prevent abusive conduct in the workplace, which policy may be adopted by employers. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Healthy Workplace Act", which requires TACIR to create a model policy for employers to prevent abusive conduct in the workplace, which policy may be adopted by employers. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 997 |
2014-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | Re-ref. to Local Government Subcommittee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee--Government Operations for review |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2226 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 997