TN HB1977 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Stopping Addiction and Fostering Excellence (SAFE) Act." - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 33; Title 47; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Stopping Addiction and Fostering Excellence (SAFE) Act." - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 33; Title 47; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1952 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020