TN HB1970 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Military Education Assistance for Tennessee Act," which provides eligibility for in-state tuition to certain honorably discharged veterans; creates tuition waiver program for members of the Tennessee state guard with at least one year of service. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Military Education Assistance for Tennessee Act," which provides eligibility for in-state tuition to certain honorably discharged veterans; creates tuition waiver program for members of the Tennessee state guard with at least one year of service. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2094 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1970&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1970.pdf |