TN HB1960 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, regulates the resale of stored value cards. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47 and Title 62.
Title
As introduced, regulates the resale of stored value cards. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47 and Title 62.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1928 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1960&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HB1960.pdf |